Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/12/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/12/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/19/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/26/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/30/2010