Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/26/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/27/2010