Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/13/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/20/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/29/2010