There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair Defense Competition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Defense to take illegal subsidization into account in evaluating proposals for contracts for major defense acquisition programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/13/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/18/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/13/2010Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 05/13/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/13/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/18/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/19/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/25/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/25/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/25/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/27/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/27/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/08/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/13/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness06/18/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5298. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/2010)

Fair Defense Competition Act - Directs the Secretary of Defense (DOD), in awarding a contract for any major defense acquisition program and conducting the cost or price evaluation of any proposal for that contract, to take into account any final panel report that concludes that an illegal subsidy (inconsistent with the Agreement on Subsidies and Countervailing Measures) has been provided with respect to: (1) any merchandise or major component of such program; or (2) the development of any merchandise or major component thereof.

Requires the Secretary, if the illegal subsidy has not been withdrawn, to increase the cost or price of the proposal by the amount of the subsidy.