Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 05/13/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/13/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/18/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/19/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/25/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/25/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/25/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/27/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/27/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/08/2010