Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/18/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/18/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/19/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/19/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/19/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/19/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/26/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/26/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/08/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew