Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/09/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/09/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/17/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/01/2010