Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/08/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/24/2010