Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/19/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/19/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/19/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/13/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/07/2010