Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/26/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/09/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/01/2010