Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/20/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/25/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/25/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/26/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/26/2010