Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/10/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/23/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/23/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/23/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/28/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/28/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/29/2010