Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/26/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/26/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/26/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/26/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/26/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/26/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/26/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/26/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/28/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/28/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/28/2010