Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
08/16/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-236.
08/16/2010 Signed by President.
08/10/2010 Presented to President.
07/30/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6543)
07/28/2010 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
06/30/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 403).(text: CR 6/28/2010 H4893)
05/25/2010 Introduced in House