There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veteran Employment Transition Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the work opportunity credit to certain recently discharged veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/25/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
06/28/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/25/2010Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2010Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2010Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (114)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/26/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/26/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/30/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 08/10/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/14/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/23/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/23/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/23/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/23/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/23/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/28/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/28/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/28/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/29/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/15/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/01/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/25/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services05/25/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/28/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5400. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/2010)

Veteran Employment Transition Act of 2010 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to revise the definition of "qualified veteran" for purposes of the work opportunity tax credit to mean recently discharged veterans and disadvantaged veterans.

Defines "recently discharged veteran" to mean: (1) any individual who has served on active duty (other than active duty for training) in the Armed Forces for more than 180 total days (whether consecutive or not); (2) any individual who has been discharged or released from active duty for a service-connected disability; and (3) any member of the National Guard who has served for more than 180 total days (whether consecutive or not) in active duty, full-time National Guard duty, or duty in state status.

Defines "disadvantaged veteran" as any veteran who is certified as being a member of a family receiving assistance under a supplemental nutrition assistance program and is entitled to compensation for a service-connected disability.

Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) and the National Guard to inform military personnel who are discharged or released from active duty of the work opportunity tax credit and provide them with documentation relating to eligibility for and use of such credit.