Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/26/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/28/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/15/2010