Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/15/2010