Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/26/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/28/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/29/2010