Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/17/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/30/2010