Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/27/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/27/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/28/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/28/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/28/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/17/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/01/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/13/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/13/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/20/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/22/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/30/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 08/10/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/10/2010