Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/15/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/15/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/15/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/15/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/16/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/23/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/13/2010