Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/28/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/28/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/28/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/28/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/15/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/30/2010