There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Genomics and Personalized Medicine Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To secure the promise of personalized medicine for all Americans by expanding and accelerating genomics research and initiatives to improve the accuracy of disease diagnosis, increase the safety of drugs, and identify novel treatments, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/27/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/27/2010Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/27/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/21/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/30/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/27/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5440.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5440. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/27/2010)

Genomics and Personalized Medicine Act of 2010 - Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish the Office of Personalized Healthcare, the purpose of which shall be to coordinate HHS activities related to genomics and personalized medicine with those of other agencies and entities to ensure that personalized medicine meets the highest standards of safety, efficacy, and clinical validity and utility.

Sets forth provisions related to the collection of genetic and genomic data, including providing for a national biobank.

Requires the Secretary, acting through the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), to establish the Committee on the Evaluation of Genomic Applications in Practice and Prevention.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) improve genomics and personalized medicine training; (2) establish a committee to examine barriers to personalized medicine product development; and (3) review billing, coverage, and reimbursement methodologies for personalized medicine products and services.

Requires the Secretary, acting through the Administrator of the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) and the Commissioner of Food and Drugs (FDA), to: (1) establish a committee to carry out a comparative analysis of laboratory review requirements; (2) facilitate the use of personalized medicine products to assess the risk for and reduce incidence of adverse drug reactions; and (3) include personalized medicine products in adverse event reporting systems.

Authorizes the Secretary, acting through the Commissioner, to require the sponsor of a drug or biological product to: (1) develop a companion diagnostic test under certain circumstances; and (2) conduct additional postmarket studies of drugs shown to be more or less effective in certain racial and ethnic subpopulations.

Requires the Commissioner to collaborate with the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to identify and terminate advertising campaigns that make false, misleading, deceptive, or unfair claims about the benefits or risks of personalized medicine products.

Requires the Director of CDC to: (1) expand efforts to increase awareness about genomics and personalized medicine; and (2) analyze marketing of personalized medicine products for which consumers have direct access.