Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/28/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/30/2010