Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/22/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/30/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/30/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/29/2010