There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To exclude an external power supply for certain security or life safety alarms and surveillance system components from the application of certain energy efficiency standards under the Energy Policy and Conservation Act.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-360. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010Presented to President.
12/21/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10933)
12/08/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8104-8105)
05/28/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-360. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010HousePresented to President.
12/22/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10933)
12/09/2010SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/08/2010-11:22amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2010-11:22amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8104-8105)
12/08/2010-11:16amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5470.
12/08/2010-11:16amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8104-8105)
12/08/2010-11:16amHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/28/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/28/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/28/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5470.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5470. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-360 (01/04/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act (EPCA) to exempt from the applicability of No-Load Mode energy efficiency standards an external power supply manufactured before July 1, 2017, that: (1) is an AC-to-AC external power supply; (2) has a nameplate output of 20 watts or more; (3) is certified by the Secretary of Energy (DOE) as being designed to be connected to a security or life safety alarm or surveillance system component; and (4) is permanently marked with a distinguishing mark established within the External Power Supply International Efficiency Marking Protocol for Single Voltage External AC-DC and AC-AC Power Supplies. Defines a "security or life safety alarm or surveillance system" as equipment designed and marketed to, on a continuous basis: (1) monitor, detect, record, or provide notification of intrusion or access to real property or physical assets or notification of threats to life safety; (2) deter or control access to real property or physical assets or to prevent the unauthorized removal of physical assets; or (3) monitor, detect, record, or provide notification of fire, gas, smoke, flooding, or other physical threats to real property, physical assets, or life safety.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) require, with appropriate safeguard for the protection of confidential business information, the submission of unit shipment data on an annual basis; and (2) restrict the eligibility of external power supplies for the exemption provided on a finding that a substantial number of external power supplies are being marketed to or installed in applications other than security or life safety alarm or surveillance systems.