Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/14/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/14/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/01/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/17/2010