There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/28/2010)

Amends the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (ARRA) to extend until January 1, 2011, the temporary increase in the federal medical assistance percentage (FMAP), under title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act (SSA), for any state with a certain unemployment increase percentage during the recession adjustment period. Extends the entire recession adjustment period from December 31, 2010, through December 31, 2011.

Declares that increases in the FMAP for a state shall apply to Medicaid payments attributable to expenditures for medical assistance provided to nonpregnant childless adults made eligible under a state plan who would have been eligible for child health assistance or other health benefits under eligibility standards in effect as of December 31, 2009, of a waiver of the state child health plan under SSA title XXI (Children's Health Insurance Program) (CHIP).

Prohibits any additional federal payments to a state under this temporary FMAP increase for a calendar quarter occurring between January 1, 2011, and June 30, 2011, unless, within 45 days after enactment of this Act, the state's chief executive officer certifies that the state will request and use such additional federal funds.