Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/26/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/26/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/28/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/09/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/03/2009