Committees: H.R.5498 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/10/2010 Referred to
06/23/2010 Markup by
11/18/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-659
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emerging Threats, Cybersecurity, and Science and Technology06/15/2010 Referred to
06/15/2010 Hearings by
06/23/2010 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce06/10/2010 Referred to
12/22/2010 Discharged from
House Agriculture06/10/2010 Referred to
11/18/2010 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Horticulture and Organic Agriculture06/30/2010 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/10/2010 Referred to
11/18/2010 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management06/11/2010 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs06/10/2010 Referred to
11/18/2010 Discharged from
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)06/10/2010 Referred to
11/18/2010 Discharged from