There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

America Stands with Israel Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit United States participation on the United Nations Human Rights Council (UNHRC) and prohibit contributions to the United Nations for the purpose of paying for any United Nations investigation into the flotilla incident.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/10/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/10/2010Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/10/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/10/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/10/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/14/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/14/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/14/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/15/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/15/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/15/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/15/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/15/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/15/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/15/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/15/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/15/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/15/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/16/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/16/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/16/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/22/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/22/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/22/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/28/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/10/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5501.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5501. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/10/2010)

America Stands with Israel Act - Expresses the sense of Congress that the United States: (1) supports Israel's right to defend itself; (2) supports Israel's naval blockade of Gaza; and (3) should oppose any investigation by the United Nations (U.N.) into the flotilla incident (involving the May 2010 Israeli interception of ships carrying supplies to Gaza).

Requires the Secretary of State to direct the U.S. Permanent Representative to the United Nations to cease U.S. participation in and membership on the United Nations Human Rights Council (UNHRC).

Prohibits the Secretary from contributing any funds to the United Nations for an investigation into the flotilla incident.

Directs the Secretary to ensure that no U.S. contributions to the United Nations are used for any such investigation, including by withholding from U.S. contributions to the regularly assessed biennial budget of the United Nations amounts equal to any amounts so expended.