Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/10/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/10/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/14/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/14/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/14/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/15/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/15/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/15/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/15/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/15/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/15/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/15/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/15/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/15/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/15/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/16/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/16/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/16/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/22/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/22/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/22/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/28/2010