There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the effective date of the gift card provisions of the Credit Card Accountability Responsibility and Disclosure Act of 2009.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/27/2010Became Public Law No: 111-209. (TXT | PDF)
07/27/2010Signed by President.
07/15/2010Presented to President.
07/13/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/13/2010Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5795)
06/14/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 0 (Roll no. 357).(text: CR H4394)
06/10/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/27/2010Became Public Law No: 111-209. (TXT | PDF)
07/27/2010Signed by President.
07/15/2010HousePresented to President.
07/14/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/13/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/13/2010SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5795)
06/15/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
06/15/2010HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1100-1101)
06/14/2010-7:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/14/2010-7:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 0 (Roll no. 357). (text: CR H4394)
06/14/2010-7:20pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4397-4398)
06/14/2010-2:35pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/14/2010-2:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5502.
06/14/2010-2:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4393-4395)
06/14/2010-2:29pmHouseMr. Hinojosa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/10/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
06/10/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/10/2010 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs06/15/2010 Referred to
07/13/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5502. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-209 (07/27/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Credit Card Accountability Responsibility and Disclosure Act of 2009 to state that, in the case of a gift certificate, store gift card, or general-use prepaid card produced before April 1, 2010, the effective date of certain disclosure requirements under the Electronic Funds Transfer Act pertaining to fees shall be delayed until January 31, 2011.

Requires the issuer of such a certificate or card, as a condition of such delayed effective date, to: (1) comply with a specified prohibition against and certain requirements for the imposition of any dormancy, inactivity, or service fees; (2) consider any such certificate or card for which funds expire to have no expiration date with respect to the underlying funds; (3) replace, at consumer request, any such certificate or card that has funds remaining at no cost to the consumer; and (4) comply with certain consumer rights disclosure requirements.