Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/01/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/01/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/13/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/14/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/15/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/21/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/21/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/21/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/27/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/27/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/29/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/30/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/10/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/10/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/10/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/14/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/14/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/28/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/17/2010