Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/17/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/17/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/2010