Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/17/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/29/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/19/2010