Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/30/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/15/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/19/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/27/2010