Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/30/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/14/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/27/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/14/2010