There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To deauthorize a portion of the project for navigation, Potomac River, Washington Channel, District of Columbia, under the jurisdiction of the Corps of Engineers.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/20/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5742-5743)
07/15/2010Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-540.
06/16/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/21/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
07/20/2010-2:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/20/2010-2:27pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5742-5743)
07/20/2010-2:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5545.
07/20/2010-2:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5742-5743)
07/20/2010-2:22pmHouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/15/2010HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.
07/15/2010HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-540.
07/01/2010HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
07/01/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/01/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/17/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/16/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/16/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/16/2010 Referred to
07/01/2010 Markup by
07/15/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-540
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment06/17/2010 Referred to
07/01/2010 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works07/21/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5545. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/20/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Deauthorizes a specified portion of the project for navigation, Potomac River, Washington Channel, District of Columbia.