Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/17/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/26/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/26/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/30/2010