Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/19/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/20/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/26/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/30/2010