Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/30/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/30/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/30/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/15/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/30/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/16/2010