Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
07/02/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-196.
07/02/2010 Signed by President.
07/01/2010 Presented to President.
06/30/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5679)
06/23/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4687)
06/22/2010 Introduced in House