Text: H.R.5569 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-196 (07/02/2010)

 
[111th Congress Public Law 196]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 124 STAT. 1352]]

Public Law 111-196
111th Congress

                                 An Act


 
   To extend the National Flood Insurance Program until September 30, 
               2010 <<NOTE: July 2, 2010 -  [H.R. 5569]>> 


    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress <<NOTE: National Flood Insurance 
Program Extension Act of 2010.THE NOTE BELOW GOES WITH "SHORT TITLE" & 
CAUSED BAD SPACING SO ADDED TO NOTE ABOVE 42 USC 4001 note.>> assembled,
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``National Flood Insurance Program 
Extension Act of 2010''.
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE PROGRAM.

    (a) Program Extension.--Section 1319 of the National Flood Insurance 
Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4026) is amended by striking ``September 30, 
2008'' and inserting ``September 30, 2010''.
    (b) Financing.--Section 1309(a) of such Act (42 U.S.C. 4016(a)) is 
amended--
            (1) by striking ``September 30, 2008'' and inserting 
        ``September 30, 2010''; and
            (2) by striking ``$20,775,000,000'' and inserting 
        ``$20,725,000,000''.

    (c) Effective Date.--The <<NOTE: 42 USC 4016 note.>> amendments made 
by subsections (a) and (b) shall be considered to have taken effect on 
May 31, 2010.
SEC. 3. BUDGET COMPLIANCE.

    The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with 
the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by 
reference to the latest statement titled ``Budgetary Effects of PAYGO 
Legislation'' for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional 
Record by the Chairman of the House Budget Committee, provided that such 
statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.

    Approved July 2, 2010.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 5569:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 156 (2010):
            June 23, considered and passed House.
            June 30, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>