Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/15/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/10/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/10/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/10/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/10/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/10/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/13/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 02/13/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/13/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/24/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/24/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/26/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/26/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/19/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/19/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/26/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/26/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/21/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/24/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/20/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/20/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/30/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/30/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew