Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/28/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/01/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/01/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/01/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/01/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/01/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/01/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/01/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/15/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2010