There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Domestic Minor Sex Trafficking Deterrence and Victims Support Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a grant program to benefit domestic minor victims of sex trafficking, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/23/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/26/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/23/2010Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/2010Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/2010Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/2010Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1176)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/01/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/28/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/16/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/16/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/16/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/16/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/30/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/08/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/08/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/16/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/23/2010 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security07/26/2010 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/23/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5575. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/23/2010)

Domestic Minor Sex Trafficking Deterrence and Victims Support Act of 2010 - Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the Attorney General should implement changes to the National Crime Information Center (NCIC) to identify endangered juveniles; (2) funds awarded under the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program should be used to provide education, training, deterrence, and prevention programs relating to sex trafficking of minors; (3) states should treat minor victims of sex trafficking as crime victims rather than as criminal defendants or juvenile delinquents and adopt and amend laws to protect and provide compensation to such victims; and (4) demand for commercial sex with sex trafficking victims must be deterred through consistent law enforcement.

Authorizes the Assistant Attorney General for the Office of Justice Programs to award one-year block grants to up to six state or local governments in different regions of the United States that have significant sex trafficking to combat such trafficking. Requires grant funds to be used to provide shelter and services to minor victims of sex trafficking and for training for service providers.

Amends title IV of the Social Security Act (Grants to States for Needy Families with Children and for Child-Welfare Services) to require states to adopt procedures for reporting information on missing or abducted children for entry into the NCIC database.

Amends the Crime Control Act of 1990 to require: (1) the Attorney General's annual statistical summary under such Act to include the total number of missing child reports received and the total number of entries made to the NCIC database; and (2) state law enforcement agencies to update the record of a missing child with a photograph taken within the previous 180 days and to notify the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children of each report of a child missing from a foster care family home or childcare institution.