Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/23/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/23/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/29/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/01/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/22/2010