Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/24/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/19/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/28/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2010