There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the airport traffic control tower located at Spokane International Airport in Spokane, Washington, as the "Ray Daves Airport Traffic Control Tower".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the Federal Aviation Administration located at Spokane International Airport in Spokane, Washington, as the "Ray Daves Air Traffic Control Tower".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/22/2010Became Public Law No: 111-326. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2010Signed by President.
12/17/2010Presented to President.
12/09/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/2010Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8690)
09/28/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7093)
09/20/2010Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-611.
06/24/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
12/22/2010Became Public Law No: 111-326. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2010Signed by President.
12/17/2010HousePresented to President.
12/10/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/09/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/2010SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8690)
09/29/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/28/2010-7:10pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2010-7:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2010-7:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7093)
09/28/2010-7:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5591.
09/28/2010-7:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7093-7094)
09/28/2010-7:08pmHouseMr. Schauer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/20/2010HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 238.
09/20/2010HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-611.
07/29/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/29/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/29/2010HouseSubcommittee on Aviation Discharged.
06/25/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/24/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/24/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/24/2010 Referred to
07/29/2010 Markup by
09/20/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-611
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation06/25/2010 Referred to
07/29/2010 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/29/2010 Referred to
12/09/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5591. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-326 (12/22/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on September 20, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the airport traffic control tower located at Spokane International Airport in Spokane, Washington, and any successor airport traffic control tower at that location, as the Ray Daves Airport Traffic Control Tower.